New Delhi: Mr. Asangba Chuba Ao (2003 batch Bihar cadre IAS officer), incumbent Joint Secretary in the Ministry of Civil Aviation, was given additional charge as the Chairman & Managing Director (CMD) of AI Assets Holding Limited (AIAHL) for a tenure of six months or until further notification. Mr. Ao had earlier served as Divisional Commissioner in the Magadh Division of Gaya.
IAS Asangba Chuba Ao Given Additional Charge as CMD, AIAHL
- officersinfo
- March 28, 2024
- 6:45 pm
President Murmu Approves Withdrawal of IAS Aneesh Sekhar’s Resignation
May 12, 2024
No Comments
Appointments & Recommendations (GoI) on 29.02.2024
February 29, 2024
No Comments
Delhi: 22 DANICS Officers Transferred, see List
July 9, 2024
No Comments
Punjab & Haryana HC: Justice Nagu appointed as Chief Justice
July 6, 2024
No Comments